U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cr-40033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 22, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 30, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • January 25, 2017: [Transport Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 23, 2016: [Continue]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 25, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • July 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2016: [Request]
  • April 18, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Request]
  • April 18, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 18, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • March 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 01, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.