U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VanHouten
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 16, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
  • July 19, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 19, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • July 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 18, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Request]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 28, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 01, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.