U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Calf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 20, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 12, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 27, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • February 19, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 18, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 03, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 03, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 18, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 13, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Supplement]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 24, 2016: [Downward Departure]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • May 13, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 03, 2016: [Request]
  • March 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 02, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 02, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 01, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.