U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wirrick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 28, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 12, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 09, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 09, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Request]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Request]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • May 13, 2016: [Transport Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 07, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 04, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 04, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.