U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Munoz Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 23, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • September 30, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 27, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 17, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 09, 2016: [Interpreter No Longer Needed]
  • March 09, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 09, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • March 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 03, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.