U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 09, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 14, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 14, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 25, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 04, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 04, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 03, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • December 03, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 03, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • December 01, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 01, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 09, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 09, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 03, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 03, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 03, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 18, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 24, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 24, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 04, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 04, 2016: [Request]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 04, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 04, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.