U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-10022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Tail
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 15, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 07, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 03, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 02, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 29, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 09, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • August 09, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 20, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 19, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 14, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 02, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 02, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 22, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 01, 2020: [Extend]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 15, 2020: [Furlough]
  • May 13, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2020: [Furlough]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 17, 2019: [Extend]
  • December 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 02, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 23, 2017: [Furlough]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 05, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Furlough]
  • May 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 19, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 09, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 23, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 05, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 11, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • April 11, 2016: [Produce ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.