U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cv-03003
  • Case Name: Dowty v. Waukazoo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • March 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • March 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2016: [New Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.