U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baybridge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Declaration]
  • June 07, 2017: [Waiver]
  • June 05, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • June 05, 2017: [Statement of Facts in Support of Pretrial Diversion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Consent]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 25, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Response]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 11, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2016: [Request]
  • May 09, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 06, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.