U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 26, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 15, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 31, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Receipt]
  • August 26, 2016: [Suppress]
  • August 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 15, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2016: [Leave to]
  • August 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Suppress]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 08, 2016: [Response]
  • April 08, 2016: [Discovery]
  • April 06, 2016: [Request]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.