U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vik
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 15, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 03, 2016: [Declaration]
  • November 03, 2016: [Waiver]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • August 15, 2016: [Exclude Period of Delay (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 15, 2016: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 10, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 06, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 06, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.