U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Booth et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 18, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2018: [Declaration]
  • January 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 31, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 30, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 18, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 31, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 28, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 19, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 07, 2016: [Discovery]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Response]
  • March 23, 2016: [Request]
  • March 23, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2016: [Request]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.