U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rippentrop
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • February 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 25, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 20, 2016: [Response]
  • May 17, 2016: [Request]
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 06, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.