U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kelliher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 25, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 20, 2016: [Response]
  • May 17, 2016: [Request]
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 05, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.