U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-50171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Boy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 17, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • December 11, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 10, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 06, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 02, 2017: [Furlough]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 10, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 17, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 17, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 14, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [Furlough]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 13, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 09, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.