U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 10, 2016: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.