U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cr-10018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [Proposed Order]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • March 11, 2016: [Certificate]
  • March 10, 2016: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • March 10, 2016: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • March 10, 2016: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.