U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lail et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • July 12, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 29, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 21, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Passport - Return of]
  • June 26, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 26, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 13, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 09, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 09, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 30, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 18, 2017: [Passport - Return of]
  • May 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 17, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 31, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 21, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 14, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 14, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 09, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 01, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 11, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 13, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 08, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Furlough]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Passport - Receipt of]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 14, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 14, 2016: [Reconsideration]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2016: [Response]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 28, 2016: [Discovery]
  • April 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2016: [Response]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 24, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 21, 2016: [Request]
  • March 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Request]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 16, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 16, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 11, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 11, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.