U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felix-Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 13, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 10, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Request]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2016: [Interpreter No Longer Needed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 14, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.