U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TaSunke Witko
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 13, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • May 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 15, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.