U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-30115-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Red Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 27, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 06, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Status Conference]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 14, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 23, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 29, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 26, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • April 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.