U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 27, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 24, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • June 18, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 17, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 29, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 29, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 29, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 29, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 16, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 15, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 15, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 26, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • April 07, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 25, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 22, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.