U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chua-Lemus et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 03, 2021: [Extend]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • April 22, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 16, 2021: [Response]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 07, 2021: [Extend]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2021: [Response]
  • March 19, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 18, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 16, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • March 12, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 08, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • July 18, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 18, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 10, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 01, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 01, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • July 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 24, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 24, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 24, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 24, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 27, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 24, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 24, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 24, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 09, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 05, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 18, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Discovery]
  • May 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 04, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 29, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 29, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 29, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 24, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • February 09, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 03, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2017: [Response]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 30, 2017: [Request]
  • January 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2017: [Jury List]
  • January 30, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • January 27, 2017: [Brief]
  • January 27, 2017: [Sever Defendant]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 11, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 07, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 04, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 14, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 12, 2016: [Reconsideration]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 16, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2016: [Departure]
  • June 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Discovery]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 07, 2016: [Discovery]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Response]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 28, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 28, 2016: [Request]
  • March 24, 2016: [Response]
  • March 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 23, 2016: [Request]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 23, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • March 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 22, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 22, 2016: [Request]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • March 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 16, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.