U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 26, 2018: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 07, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2016: [In Limine]
  • September 06, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 06, 2016: [Jury List]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice]
  • September 06, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 02, 2016: [Consent]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 07, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 07, 2016: [Request]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 05, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 05, 2016: [Request]
  • April 05, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 04, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.