U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sampson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 23, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Departure]
  • October 19, 2016: [Variance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 20, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 02, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 30, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 30, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2016: [Request]
  • March 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.