U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lovejoy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 07, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 02, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 28, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 29, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 19, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 19, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [Letter]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 05, 2016: [Request]
  • April 04, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Request]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 28, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.