U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-50099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 10, 2019: [Transcript]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 27, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 26, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 08, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Sealed Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 31, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 10, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 06, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 08, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 24, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Warrant]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 19, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 15, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • September 06, 2016: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 10, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 10, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.