U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Two Charger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 06, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 25, 2016: [Furlough]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2016: [Request]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 25, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 25, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 25, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2016: [Request]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.