U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 16, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 16, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 11, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 11, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 28, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 17, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 13, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 12, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 11, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 15, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 31, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 23, 2016: [Request]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 18, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.