U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Has Horns
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 15, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 24, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2018: [Furlough]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 16, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • November 17, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 07, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 03, 2016: [Furlough]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 02, 2016: [Furlough]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2016: [Request]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 18, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.