U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 17, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 17, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 17, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 19, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2016: [Request]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.