U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Potter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • April 13, 2017: [Request for Early Termination]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 15, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 14, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 30, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • June 14, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 20, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 19, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2016: [Request]
  • March 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.