U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Response]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 04, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Response]
  • June 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 15, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 10, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Suppress]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 25, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2016: [Request]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 24, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.