U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larrabee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 17, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 16, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 25, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • February 09, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
  • November 22, 2019: [Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 20, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • October 24, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • October 18, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 18, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 18, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 10, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 08, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 08, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 27, 2016: [Suppress]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Request]
  • March 30, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2016: [Request]
  • March 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 25, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 24, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.