U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crow Ghost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 02, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 12, 2018: [Furlough]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 27, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 21, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • June 25, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 25, 2018: [Request for Summons]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 25, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 26, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 12, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 07, 2016: [Request]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2016: [Request]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 05, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.