U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poorman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 28, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 09, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Dismiss Count]
  • September 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 25, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 20, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 20, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 19, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2016: [Request]
  • April 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 05, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 04, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 30, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 30, 2016: [Request]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.