U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-30002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spotted Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 25, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 18, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 15, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 31, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 31, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 31, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.