U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peterson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Request for Warrant]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 26, 2021: [Furlough]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 12, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 02, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 13, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 17, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 21, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 16, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 08, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 19, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Status Conference]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 25, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2017: [Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 23, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 23, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 10, 2016: [Discovery]
  • November 08, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 07, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Response]
  • April 22, 2016: [Request]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 20, 2016: [Discovery]
  • April 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 07, 2016: [Discovery]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Response]
  • March 30, 2016: [Request]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • March 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 25, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 24, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 23, 2016: [Change Venue]
  • March 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.