U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spider
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2017: [Evaluation]
  • March 02, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 02, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • January 13, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 13, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 25, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 25, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 16, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 07, 2016: [Competency Report]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Competency Evaluation]
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice]
  • August 24, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 24, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 24, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Suppress]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 21, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 13, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2016: [Arrest]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.