U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swalley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 15, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 24, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 16, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 17, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 17, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 17, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 17, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 17, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 16, 2018: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 02, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 08, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 28, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 28, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • December 28, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 05, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • October 12, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 12, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 12, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 12, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • May 11, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Request]
  • April 13, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Request]
  • April 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 24, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.