U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hatchett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 02, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • July 09, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • November 24, 2017: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 17, 2017: [Release from Custody]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 27, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 23, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 22, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • June 22, 2017: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 22, 2017: [Request for Warrant]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 26, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 17, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [Request]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 01, 2016: [Arrest]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.