U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lone Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 05, 2016: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 28, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 28, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 30, 2016: [Extend]
  • August 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 01, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 27, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 18, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 18, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 18, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 01, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 01, 2016: [Request]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 29, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.