U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flute
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 02, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 04, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 29, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 29, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 09, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 09, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2017: [Request]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.