U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 10, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 19, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • January 31, 2018: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 18, 2017: [Furlough]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 14, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 14, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 23, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 04, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 21, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice]
  • August 02, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 20, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 20, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 13, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 13, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Request]
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 24, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 24, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.