U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Long Black Cat
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • July 12, 2016: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 12, 2016: [Verdict]
  • July 12, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 11, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 11, 2016: [Jury List]
  • July 11, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • July 11, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 08, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Objection]
  • June 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 29, 2016: [In Limine]
  • June 22, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 20, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 13, 2016: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • May 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Request]
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.