U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rowland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 10, 2022: [Furlough]
  • August 04, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 21, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 28, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 28, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 12, 2018: [Furlough]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 21, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 14, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 22, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 05, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 22, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 01, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 20, 2016: [Furlough]
  • April 18, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 12, 2016: [Request]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 08, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2016: [Arrest]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.