U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wounded
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 04, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2016: [Request]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 20, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2016: [Arrest]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.