U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marshall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 12, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 12, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • February 07, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 30, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 15, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Furlough]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 07, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 26, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • August 12, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2016: [Arrest]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • July 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 06, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 24, 2016: [Reconsideration]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 18, 2016: [Request]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 11, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.