U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bald Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 28, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 19, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 15, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Competency Report]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • November 18, 2016: [Competency Evaluation]
  • November 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 10, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 15, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Reconsideration]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 29, 2016: [Request]
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 24, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.