U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Silk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • June 04, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Evaluation]
  • January 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • October 24, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 24, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 05, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2016: [Request]
  • March 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.